House | 02/21/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2623. | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 271. | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2024 12:30PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Subcommittee: Lundgren, Baeth and Meyer, A. H.J. 154. | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 152. | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |