House | 02/19/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2583. | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 271. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2024 11:30AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Subcommittee: Wood, Boden and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 171. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 169. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |