House | 02/12/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2462. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 235. | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2024 4:30PM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Subcommittee: Gustoff, Srinivas and Wills, J. H.J. 171. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 170. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |