House | 02/20/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 353. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 362. | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2023 12:00PM RM 304.1. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Subcommittee: Osmundson, Harris and Isenhart. H.J. 133. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 131. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |