House | 02/15/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2550. | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 273. | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2024 11:30AM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Subcommittee: Young, Johnson and Nielsen. H.J. 206. | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 203. | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |