House | 03/27/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2677. | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 682. | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2024 12:00PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Subcommittee: Siegrist, Forbes and Harris. H.J. 233. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 230. | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |