House | 03/07/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2652. | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 538. | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/29/2024 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Subcommittee: Nordman, Stone and Wilburn. H.J. 246. | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 244. | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | By COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS |