House | 03/27/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2674. | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 682. | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2024 12:30PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Subcommittee reassigned: Wulf, Bloomingdale and Forbes. H.J. 339. | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bloomingdale and Forbes. H.J. 339. | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 338. | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |