House | 03/07/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2655. | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 540. | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/29/2024 12:00PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Subcommittee: Boden, Bloomingdale and Judge. H.J. 383. | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 381. | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |