House | 01/30/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 151. | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 179. | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2023 12:30PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2023 12:45PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult (Cancelled). | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Subcommittee: Lohse, Madison and Wilz, H. H.J. 73. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 72. | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |