House | 02/24/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 427. | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 384. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2023 12:00PM RM 304. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Subcommittee: Wood, Matson and Meyer, A. H.J. 188. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 185. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |