House | 02/09/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 258. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 278. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2023 12:15PM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Subcommittee: Dunwell, Gerhold and Wilson. H.J. 188. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 186. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |