House | 02/13/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 271. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 277. | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2023 2:45PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Subcommittee: Young, Graber and Judge. H.J. 188. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 186. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |