Senate | 02/16/2023 | Message from House. S.J. 347. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Immediate message. H.J. 351. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Resolution adopted. H.J. 345. | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Substituted for HCR 7. H.J. 339. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Passed on file. H.J. 293. | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Introduced, referred to Ethics. H.J. 244. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Message from Senate. H.J. 217. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Immediate message. S.J. 226. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Resolution adopted. S.J. 226. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 197. | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 190. |