LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SF113
Action History
IA
Iowa Senate Bill SF113
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa Senate Bill SF113
Action History
Senate
03/22/2023
Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 555. S.J. 680.
Senate
03/14/2023
Subcommittee reassigned: Dickey, Dawson, and Jochum. S.J. 569.
Senate
03/13/2023
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/15/2023 1:30PM Room 217 Conference Room.
Senate
01/31/2023
Subcommittee: Dickey, Dawson, and Petersen. S.J. 216.
Senate
01/24/2023
Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 173.