Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Signed by Governor. S.J. 998.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 986.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 731.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 756.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 754.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on calendar. H.J. 707.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 707.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2023 12:45PM House Lounge.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Subcommittee: Golding, Siegrist and Steckman. H.J. 561.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Explanation of vote. S.J. 344.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 284.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 280.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 288.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 281.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 188.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 183.
|
|
|