Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Explanation of vote. S.J. 344.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Withdrawn. S.J. 288.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
HF 161 substituted. S.J. 287.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Attached to HF 161. S.J. 287.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendments S-3004, S-3005, S-3006, and S-3014 out of order. S.J. 287.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendment S-3015 adopted. S.J. 286.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendment S-3017 filed, lost. S.J. 286.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendment S-3018 filed, lost. S.J. 285.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendment S-3020 filed, lost. S.J. 284.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendment S-3021 filed, lost. S.J. 283.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendment S-3019 filed, lost. S.J. 283.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendment S-3016 filed, lost. S.J. 282.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Amendment S-3015 filed. S.J. 282.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Amendment S-3014 filed. S.J. 279.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Amendment S-3006 filed. S.J. 241.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Amendments S-3004 and S-3005 filed. S.J. 209.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 199.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 192.
|
|
|