Senate | 01/23/2023 | Subcommittee: Costello, Dotzler, and Lofgren. S.J. 169. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 146. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 145. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/11/2023 8:30AM Senate Lounge. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Alons, and Dotzler. S.J. 81. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 45. |