Senate | 02/15/2023 | Explanation of vote. S.J. 344. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 284. | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Message from Senate. H.J. 281. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Immediate message. S.J. 292. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Passed Senate, yeas 34, nays 15. S.J. 291. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Amendment S-3022 filed, lost. S.J. 290. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 276. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2023 2:00PM Room 315. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Subcommittee: Garrett, Boulton, and Schultz. S.J. 217. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 206. |