Senate | 01/31/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2154. S.J. 190. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2024 11:30AM Room 315. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Subcommittee: Webster, Lofgren, and Quirmbach. S.J. 96. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Referred to Local Government. S.J. 1091. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Amendment S-3060 filed. S.J. 541. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 220. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 212. |