Senate | 03/21/2024 | Placed on calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 614. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2024 11:00AM Room 217 Conference Room. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Subcommittee: Dawson, Jochum, and Zaun. S.J. 60. | ||
Senate | 12/31/2023 | END OF [] ACTIONS | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1091. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 721. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 220. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 214. |