Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by Governor. S.J. 1003.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1003.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 731.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 756.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 94, nays 1. H.J. 755.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on calendar. H.J. 708.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 708.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/21/2023 8:00AM House Lounge.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Subcommittee: Collins, Cooling and Dunwell. H.J. 673.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 651.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 649.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 584.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 581.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 259.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 252.
|
|
|