LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SF204
Action History
IA
Iowa Senate Bill SF204
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa Senate Bill SF204
Action History
Senate
03/06/2023
Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 523. S.J. 503.
Senate
02/23/2023
Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Senate
02/20/2023
Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2023 9:30AM Room 217 Conference Room.
Senate
02/07/2023
Subcommittee: Dawson, Boulton, and Zaun. S.J. 275.
Senate
02/02/2023
Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 254.