LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SF2052
Action History
IA
Iowa Senate Bill SF2052
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa Senate Bill SF2052
Action History
Senate
02/15/2024
Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2382. S.J. 319.
Senate
02/07/2024
Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Senate
02/01/2024
Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2024 1:00PM Senate Lounge.
Senate
02/01/2024
Subcommittee reassigned: Webster, Bisignano, and Bousselot. S.J. 199.
Senate
01/22/2024
Subcommittee: Webster, Bisignano, and Salmon. S.J. 132.
Senate
01/17/2024
Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 112.