Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Signed by Governor. S.J. 953.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 896.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 772.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 756.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 745.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 89, nays 0. H.J. 744.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 635.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Placed on calendar. H.J. 606.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 606.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2024 12:00PM House Lounge.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Nielsen and Wills, J. H.J. 362.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 319.
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 297.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 324.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 322.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 171.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2024 2:00PM Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Subcommittee: Webster, Bisignano, and Dickey. S.J. 145.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Introduced, referred to Commerce. S.J. 113.
|
|
|