Senate | 02/26/2024 | Amendment S-5022 filed. S.J. 388. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Fiscal note. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Amendment S-5001 filed. S.J. 185. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 185. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2024 12:00PM Senate Lounge. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Subcommittee: Brown, Alons, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 138. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. S.J. 114. |