Senate | 03/09/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 547. S.J. 548. | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Fiscal note. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2023 1:00PM Room G15. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Subcommittee: Klimesh, Brown, and T. Taylor. S.J. 340. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 304. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 269. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 265. |