Senate | 02/12/2024 | Subcommittee: Costello, Dotzler, and Reichman. S.J. 268. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 244. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 229. | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 11:30AM Senate Lounge. | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Subcommittee: Salmon, McClintock, and Weiner. S.J. 139. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2024 | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 130. |