LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SF2078
Action History
IA
Iowa Senate Bill SF2078
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa Senate Bill SF2078
Action History
Senate
02/19/2024
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 338.
Senate
02/14/2024
Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Senate
02/13/2024
Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2024 1:00PM Room 217 Conference Room.
Senate
02/13/2024
Subcommittee reassigned: Salmon, Weiner, and Westrich. S.J. 277.
Senate
01/23/2024
Subcommittee: Schultz, Salmon, and Weiner. S.J. 139.
Senate
01/22/2024
Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 130.