Senate | 04/09/2024 | Withdrawn. S.J. 764. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | HF 2668 substituted. S.J. 763. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Amendment S-5123 adopted. S.J. 763. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Amendment S-5123 filed. S.J. 755. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Attached to HF 2668. S.J. 666. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 536. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Fiscal note. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 184. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 177. |