Senate | 03/07/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2407. S.J. 468. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2024 1:00PM Senate Lounge. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Subcommittee: Driscoll, Dotzler, and Rowley. S.J. 366. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 320. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 230. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 225. |