Senate | 03/19/2024 | Withdrawn. S.J. 585. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | HF 2262 substituted. S.J. 584. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Attached to HF 2262. S.J. 341. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Fiscal note. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 256. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 251. |