Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Signed by Governor. S.J. 809.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 808.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 703.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 675.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 672.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Senate concurred with S-5105. S.J. 672.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Message from House, with amendment S-5105. S.J. 665.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 690.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 95, nays 2. H.J. 689.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Amendment H-8244 adopted. H.J. 689.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Amendment H-8244 filed. H.J. 658.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 635.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on calendar. H.J. 539.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 539.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2024 8:45AM House Lounge.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Subcommittee: Wulf, Baeth and Collins. H.J. 509.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 366.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 342.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 364.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 37, nays 9. S.J. 364.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment S-5019 filed, adopted. S.J. 363.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 297.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 284.
|
|
|