Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Signed by Governor. S.J. 809.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 808.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 592.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 633.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 623.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 64, nays 30. H.J. 622.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Substituted for HF 2567. H.J. 621.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 512.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 511.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 452.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 34, nays 16. S.J. 452.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment S-5048 filed, lost. S.J. 451.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 290.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 286.
|
|
|