Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Signed by Governor. S.J. 963.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 961.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 876.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 907.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 14. S.J. 905.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Senate concurred with S-5170. S.J. 905.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Message from House, with amendment S-5170. S.J. 851.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 815.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 54, nays 42. H.J. 814.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Amendment H-8325 adopted, as amended. H.J. 813.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 813.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-8331 to amendment H-8325, yeas 34, nays 62. H.J. 812.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Point of order raised on amendment H-8331 to amendment H-8325, ruled not germane. H.J. 812.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Amendment H-8331 filed. H.J. 812.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 812.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-8330 to amendment H-8325, yeas 34, nays 62. H.J. 811.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Point of order raised on amendment H-8330 to amendment H-8325, ruled not germane. H.J. 811.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Amendment H-8330 filed. H.J. 811.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Amendment H-8329 to amendment H-8325, yeas 42, nays 54, filed, lost. H.J. 810.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 815.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Amendment H-8333 to amendment H-8325, yeas 56, nays 40, filed, adopted. H.J. 809.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Amendment H-8328 to amendment H-8325, yeas 38, nays 58, filed, lost. H.J. 808.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Amendment H-8327 to amendment H-8325, yeas 35, nays 62, filed, lost. H.J. 807.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Amendment H-8326 to amendment H-8325, yeas 35, nays 62, filed, lost. H.J. 806.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Amendment H-8325 filed. H.J. 806.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Amendment H-8318, yeas 34, nays 63, lost. H.J. 805.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Substituted for HF 2574. H.J. 805.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Amendment H-8318 filed. H.J. 793.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 777.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 777.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 790.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 30, nays 14. S.J. 790.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Amendment S-5132 adopted, as amended. S.J. 789.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Amendment S-5137 to S-5132 adopted. S.J. 789.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Amendment S-5144 filed, lost. S.J. 788.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Amendment S-5146 filed, lost. S.J. 788.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Amendment S-5145 filed, lost. S.J. 787.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Deferred. S.J. 777.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Amendments S-5132 and S-5137 filed. S.J. 776.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 338.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 333.
|
|
|