House | 04/19/2024 | Placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 930. | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 930. | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Subcommittee: Thompson, P., Best and Forbes. H.J. 793. | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 761. | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Message from Senate. H.J. 761. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Immediate message. S.J. 776. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 1. S.J. 774. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Fiscal note. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 750. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 746. |