Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Signed by Governor. S.J. 963.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
NOBA: Final
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 961.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 897.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 869.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 75, nays 16. H.J. 863.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 863.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Motion to suspend rules for the immediate consideration of amendment H-8352, yeas 34, nays 57. H.J. 862.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Point of order raised on amendment H-8352, ruled not germane. H.J. 862.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Amendment H-8352 filed. H.J. 862.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Substituted for HF 2697. H.J. 862.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
NOBA: Senate Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 830.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 870.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 869.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Amendment S-5176 filed, adopted. S.J. 869.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Amendment S-5171 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 869.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
NOBA: Senate Full Approps
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 748.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 747.
|
|
|