Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Signed by Governor. S.J. 963.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
NOBA: Final
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 961.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 898.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
NOBA: Senate Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 869.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 56, nays 35. H.J. 868.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Amendment H-8370, yeas 38, nays 53, filed, lost. H.J. 867.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Substituted for HF 2696. H.J. 867.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 849.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 847.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 887.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 31, nays 13. S.J. 887.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Amendment S-5192 adopted. S.J. 886.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Amendment S-5195 filed, lost. S.J. 886.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Amendment S-5192 filed. S.J. 886.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
NOBA: Senate Full Approps
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 749.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 747.
|
|
|