Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Signed by Governor. S.J. 964.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
NOBA: Final
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 961.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 876.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 904.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 14. S.J. 902.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Senate concurred with S-5203. S.J. 901.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Message from House, with amendment S-5203. S.J. 898.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
NOBA: Senate Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 869.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 52, nays 43. H.J. 854.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Amendment H-8366, yeas 36, nays 59, filed, lost. H.J. 853.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Amendment H-8365, yeas 36, nays 59, filed, lost. H.J. 852.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Amendment H-8364, yeas 35, nays 60, filed, lost. H.J. 851.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Amendment H-8369 filed, adopted. H.J. 851.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Substituted for HF 2704. H.J. 850.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 849.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 847.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 885.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 13. S.J. 884.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Amendment S-5190 filed, adopted. S.J. 884.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
NOBA: Senate Full Approps
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 779.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 778.
|
|
|