Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Signed by Governor. S.J. 964.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
NOBA: Final
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 961.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
NOBA: Senate Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Message from House. S.J. 909.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 891.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 90, nays 1. H.J. 881.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Substituted for HF 2695. H.J. 881.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 850.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 850.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 891.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0. S.J. 890.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Amendment S-5197 filed, adopted. S.J. 890.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
NOBA: Senate Full Approps
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 780.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 779.
|
|
|