House
|
03/12/2024
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2024
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2024 1:00PM House Lounge.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Subcommittee: Hora, Boden and Ehlert. H.J. 536.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Rereferred to Education. H.J. 1030.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 776.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on calendar. H.J. 748.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 748.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Subcommittee reassigned: Hora, Collins and Steckman. H.J. 740.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/29/2023 12:00PM House Lounge.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Subcommittee: Hora, Collins and Ehlert. H.J. 735.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 730.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 728.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 663.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 662.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 301.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 297.
|
|
|