Senate | 03/28/2023 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 719. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 708. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Message from House. S.J. 594. | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Immediate message. H.J. 653. | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Passed House, yeas 97, nays 0. H.J. 643. | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Substituted for HF 346. H.J. 643. | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 514. | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Message from Senate. H.J. 510. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Immediate message. S.J. 486. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 484. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 316. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 312. |