Senate | 01/31/2024 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2024 9:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Subcommittee: Bousselot, Boulton, and Webster. S.J. 96. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1091. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Fiscal note. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 501. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2023 3:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Subcommittee: Bousselot, Boulton, and Webster. S.J. 323. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 313. |