Senate | 04/06/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 566. S.J. 748. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/08/2023 1:00PM Room 315. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Subcommittee: Rowley, Brown, and Petersen. S.J. 497. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 456. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 427. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 420. |