Senate | 02/15/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2353. S.J. 315. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2024 2:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Knox, and Shipley. S.J. 97. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1092. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 468. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 460. |