Senate | 03/09/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 549. S.J. 548. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/08/2023 9:00AM Room 217 Conference Room. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Subcommittee: Bousselot, Petersen, and Sweeney. S.J. 498. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 478. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 465. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 463. |