House
|
03/29/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/29/2023 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Subcommittee: Harris, Baeth and Wulf. H.J. 732.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Rereferred to State Government. H.J. 731.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/16/2023 10:30AM House Lounge.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Subcommittee: Fisher, Baeth and Hayes. H.J. 653.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Read first time, referred to Environmental Protection. H.J. 623.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 603.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 568.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 14. S.J. 567.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Amendment S-3071 filed, adopted. S.J. 567.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 506.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 492.
|
|
|