Senate | 01/12/2024 | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Knox, and Zumbach. S.J. 103. | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 1092. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Attached to HF 572. S.J. 771. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Fiscal note. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 507. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 493. |