LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SF543
Action History
IA
Iowa Senate Bill SF543
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa Senate Bill SF543
Action History
Senate
01/11/2024
Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Zaun. S.J. 98.
Senate
06/05/2023
Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1092.
Senate
04/13/2023
Attached to HF 654. S.J. 776.
Senate
03/30/2023
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722.
Senate
03/06/2023
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 505.
Senate
03/06/2023
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 496.