House | 02/28/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2024 12:30PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult (Cancelled). | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Subcommittee: Harris, Isenhart and Wulf. H.J. 338. | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 908. | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Message from Senate. H.J. 901. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Immediate message. S.J. 906. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Passed Senate, yeas 37, nays 12. S.J. 906. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Amendment S-3169 filed, adopted. S.J. 906. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Amendment S-3115 withdrawn. S.J. 906. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Fiscal note. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Amendment S-3115 filed. S.J. 738. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 723. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 547. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 546. |